THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 17:07:17 PM
Sediqzadah, Saadia
CPSO#:
105885
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Nov 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Nov 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Pashto
Education: University of Ottawa, 2015
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
17th Floor
30 Bond St
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:26 Aug 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAADIA SEDIQZADAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEDIQZADAH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 12 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 13 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 12 Aug 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 13 Aug 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 12 Aug 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 13 Aug 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2020 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 23 Nov 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Nov 2020 |