THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 11:49:54 AM
Sattari Khavas, Shabnam
CPSO#:
105777
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Nov 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Nov 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Islamic Azad University, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
#A205 - 11685 Yonge Street
VitaCare OBGYN Clinic
Richmond Hill ON L4E 0K7
Phone: (905) 770 0033
Fax: (437) 377-0034
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital |
Vaughan |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Stevenson Memorial Hospital |
Alliston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:01 Sep 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHABNAM SATTARI KHAVAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SATTARI KHAVAS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
AVP - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 28 Jul 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Jul 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 2020 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 2020 |