THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 10:02:20 AM
Sassi, Rosaria Rita Siervo
CPSO#:
105755
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
27 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Nov 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Sao Paulo, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: R. Sassi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 8 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:01 Sep 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 23 Sep 2015
AVP - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Oct 2020 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 25 Nov 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Nov 2020 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 27 May 2022 |