THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 7:25:41 AM
Lim, Teresa
CPSO#:
105696
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Apr 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
21 Apr 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Yeshiva Univ Albert Einstein Coll of Med, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2877 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON M1E 4C1
Phone: (416) 281-7301
Fax: (416) 281 7465
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry |
Effective:15 Dec 2016 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Psychiatry |
Effective:18 May 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Apr 2015 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Apr 2015 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 20 Oct 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Oct 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Dec 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Dec 2016 |
|
Active |