THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 20:43:09 PM
Hanna, Viola Kamal Batra
CPSO#:
105691
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Mar 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Mar 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Wexford Medical Clinic
6 - 1 Wexford Rd
Brampton ON L6Z 2W1
Phone: (905) 970-1600
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Dec 2017 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VIOLA KAMAL BATRA HANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANNA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Apr 2015 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Apr 2015 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 20 Apr 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 May 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Aug 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Mar 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Mar 2018 |