THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 0:08:53 AM
Poolacherla, Vasavi Raju
CPSO#:
105504
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Sep 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
24 Sep 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Tamil, Telugu
Education: Sri Venkatesvara University, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Psychiatry
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: 5196858500 Ext. 77092
Electoral District: 02
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
McMaster Childrens Hospital, 1200 Main Street West, Hamilton, ON, L8N 3Z5
Date Received: 24 May 2016
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:24 Sep 2018 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry |
Effective:09 Nov 2023 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2015 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Mar 2015 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 15 Jan 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Nov 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Nov 2023 |
|
Active |