THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 8:01:03 AM
Babak, Sam
CPSO#:
105467
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Nov 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Nov 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Persian
Education: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
377 Church St
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Markham ON L6B 1A1
Phone: 9054727068
Fax: 9054727046
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:08 May 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:27 Sep 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAM BABAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BABAK is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Feb 2015 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Feb 2015 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 10 Feb 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Nov 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Nov 2015 |