THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 8:19:27 AM
Anago, Anthony Elochukwu
CPSO#:
105452
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Oct 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Oct 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Igbo
Education: NNAMDI AZIKIWE UNIVERSITY, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Grey Bruce Health Services
1800 8th St E
Owen Sound, ON
N4K 6M9
Owen Sound ON N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Electoral District: 03
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland
New Brunswick
Nigeria
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance |
Chatham |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound |
Owen Sound |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:13 May 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANTHONY ELOCHUKWU ANAGO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANAGO is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Feb 2015 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Feb 2015 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 01 Feb 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Oct 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Oct 2016 |