THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 13:22:47 PM
Pinilla Echeverri, Natalia
CPSO#:
105404
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Apr 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Apr 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: University of Caldas, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Colombia
Spain
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiology |
Effective:01 Apr 2018 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2015 to 12 Mar 2015
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
McMaster University, 13 Mar 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 28 Feb 2017
CF - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Mar 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jan 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Mar 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Aug 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Aug 2023 |
|
Active |