THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 1:13:05 AM
Moore, Sarah Elizabeth
CPSO#:
105389
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
212-955 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple ON L6A 4P9
Phone: 905-553-0339
Fax: 905-553-0345
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Havey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 18 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital |
Vaughan |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Colorectal Surgery |
Effective:26 Sep 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SARAH ELIZABETH MOORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOORE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 09 Feb 2015 to 06 Mar 2015
EL - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Colorectal Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Colorectal Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Feb 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Mar 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |