THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 14:34:38 PM
Luzzi, Carla Andrea
CPSO#:
105368
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Apr 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Apr 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese
Education: Universidade do Extremo Sul Catarinense, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia and
Pain Medicine
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3567
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Brazil
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 Apr 2020 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 12 Mar 2015
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 13 Mar 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jan 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Mar 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Jan 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Jan 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Dec 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2020 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 31 Mar 2027 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Feb 2022 |
|
Active |