THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 5:19:36 AM
Read, Dale
CPSO#:
105259
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Feb 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Feb 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Robertson, Dale (used until: 09 Aug 2016 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
20260 County Road 43
Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital
Alexandria ON K0C 1A0
Phone: (613) 525-2222
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Dale Read Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 2 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cornwall Community Hospital |
Cornwall |
Englehart and District Hospital |
Englehart |
Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital |
Alexandria |
Kirkland and District Hospital |
Kirkland Lake |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:03 Feb 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DALE READ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. READ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 12 Jan 2015 to 08 Feb 2015
EL - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jan 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Feb 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Feb 2015 |