THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 17:36:20 PM
Providence, Glen Kenneth
CPSO#:
105248
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Dec 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
15 Dec 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
530 Tecumseh St
Dresden ON N0P 1M0
Phone: (519) 683-4479
Fax: (519) 683-2763
Electoral District: 01
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Glen K. Providence Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 27 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance |
Chatham |
Erie Shores HealthCare |
Leamington |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:15 Dec 2014 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 2014 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Dec 2014 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 06 May 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Jun 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jun 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jun 2016 |
|
Active |