THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 2:23:54 AM
Khalil, Diana Emad
CPSO#:
105238
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jul 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
200-564 Belmont Ave W
Kitchener ON N2M 5N6
Phone: 519-570-3377
Fax: 519-888-1079
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cambridge Memorial Hospital |
Cambridge |
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance |
Chatham |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DIANA EMAD KHALIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALIL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 05 Jan 2015 to 17 Jan 2015
EL - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 01 Jan 2018
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jan 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Jan 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 2016 |