THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 15:08:38 PM
Epelman, Slava
CPSO#:
105228
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Dec 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
03 Dec 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian
Education: University of Calgary, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Medical Discovery Tower,
MaRS building
101 College St,
3rd floor, Rm 903
Toronto ON M5G 1L7
Phone: (416) 340-5309
Fax: (416) 340-4127
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:06 May 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:09 Jun 2016 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Dec 2014 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Dec 2014 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 02 Jun 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Feb 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 May 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Jun 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Jun 2016 |
|
Active |