THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 2:50:25 AM
Quon, Michael Joseph
CPSO#:
105189
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Feb 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Feb 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1053 Carling Ave
Box 209 - Room D107
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: 613 737 8899 Ext. 12906
Fax: 613 761 4186
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
General Internal Medicine |
Effective:27 Sep 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOSEPH QUON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 17 Nov 2014 to 14 Dec 2014
EL - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 15 Dec 2014 to 11 Jan 2015
EL - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Jan 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Feb 2017 |