THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 3:51:11 AM
Torontour, Samuel
CPSO#:
105171
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Apr 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Apr 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1935 Bank St
Ottawa ON K1V 8A3
Electoral District: 07
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Fees may apply
Kitchissippi Medical Clinic, 6th Floor, 1081 Carling Avenue, Ottawa, ON, K1Y 4G2
Date Received: 12 Sep 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAMUEL TORONTOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TORONTOUR is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Nov 2014 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Nov 2014 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 06 Nov 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Apr 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Apr 2015 |