THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 10:40:31 AM
Paul, Ryan Augustine
CPSO#:
105159
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Aug 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
East Wing, 2nd Floor, Rm. 400
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Western Hospital
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: 4166035839
Fax: 4166035392
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Ryan A. Paul Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RYAN AUGUSTINE PAUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAUL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 18 Nov 2014 to 14 Dec 2014
EL - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 15 Dec 2014 to 11 Jan 2015
EL - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2016 to 31 Jul 2017
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Jul 2018
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Nov 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Jan 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2016 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Aug 2016 |