THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 2:09:21 AM
Sukosd, Eva
CPSO#:
105151
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
31 Oct 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hungarian, Romanian
Education: Institute Medicine,Pharmacy,Tirgu-Mures, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Eva Sukosd Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking access to a copy or transfer of their medical record can contact Dr. Harry Kahlon at Sam's Pharmacy and Walk in Clinic at the address and telephone number above.
Patients who are looking for a copy of their medical record with Dr. Sukosd should contact RASCI-Record Access Services Canada Toll-Free at (1-800-971-8038 ext. 702).
284 Geneva Street, St. Catharines, ON L2N 2E8 Tel: (289) 362 5525
Date Received: 16 Sep 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 2014 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |