THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 19:29:02 PM
Sheffield, Brandon Samuel
CPSO#:
105106
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Jul 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Jul 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Phone: 905 494 2120 Ext. 50662
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRANDON SAMUEL SHEFFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEFFIELD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 20 Oct 2014 to 31 Oct 2014
EL - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 12 Jan 2015 to 08 Feb 2015
EL - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jan 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Feb 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jul 2017 |