THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 14:16:31 PM
Al-Azem, Omar
CPSO#:
105075
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Dec 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Dec 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2014
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
339 Windermere Rd
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: 519-455-6936
Fax: 226-213-4489
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Alexandra Hospital |
Ingersoll |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:12 Dec 2016 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. OMAR AL-AZEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-AZEM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 21 Oct 2014 to 13 Jan 2015
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 14 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 20 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 21 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 20 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jan 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Oct 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Dec 2016 |