THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 3:31:47 AM
Lau, Justin
CPSO#:
105057
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Dec 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Dec 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 2014
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1-1915 Ironoak Way
Oakville ON L6H 0N1
Phone: 289-644-2822
Fax: 905-844-8604
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:13 Oct 2016 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JUSTIN LAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 21 Oct 2014 to 13 Jan 2015
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 14 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 20 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jan 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Oct 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Dec 2016 |