THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 22:27:50 PM
Schwarz, Fabian
CPSO#:
105032
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Feb 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Feb 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, German, Norwegian
Education: University of Queensland Faculty of Medi, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
22 Barnstone Drive
Attending Physician Prince of Wales
Ottawa ON K2G 2P9
Phone: 6138439887
Fax: 6138238511
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia
Germany
Norway
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kemptville District Hospital |
Kemptville |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Rehabilitation Centre |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Winchester District Memorial Hospital |
Winchester |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:21 Oct 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FABIAN SCHWARZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHWARZ is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 2014 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Sep 2014 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 27 Sep 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Sep 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Feb 2015 |