THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 19:49:45 PM
Li, Ming
CPSO#:
104990
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Oct 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Oct 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Mandarin
Education: Ningxia Medical College, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 250
123 Third Avenue
Timmins ON P4N 1C6
Phone: (705) 264-1313
Fax: 705-268-7444
Electoral District: 08
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
China
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Temiskaming Hospital |
New Liskeard |
Timmins and District Hospital |
Timmins |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:13 Oct 2016 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MING LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 20 Oct 2014 to 11 Jan 2015
AVP - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 12 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 25 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 26 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 16 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jan 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Oct 2016 |