THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 8:03:57 AM
Zani-Ruttenstock, Elke Maria
CPSO#:
104974
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education (Clinical Fellow)
as of
01 Jul 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Graz, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital
800 Commissioners Rd W
London ON N6A 5W9
Electoral District: 02
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ELKE MARIA ZANI-RUTTENSTOCK may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ZANI-RUTTENSTOCK is enrolled at WESTERN UNIVERSITY;
(2) Dr. ZANI-RUTTENSTOCK shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ZANI-RUTTENSTOCK is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ZANI-RUTTENSTOCK shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. ZANI-RUTTENSTOCK ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. ZANI-RUTTENSTOCK ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
Note: This certificate expires on 31 Jul 2024.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2014 to 23 Nov 2014
PEAP - CF - Pediatric General Surgery
University of Toronto, 24 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Pediatric General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Pediatric General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Pediatric General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Pediatric General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Pediatric General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 31 Jul 2019
CF - Pediatric General Surgery
Western University, 01 Jul 2022 to 23 Sep 2022
PEAP - CF - General Surgery
Western University, 24 Sep 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
CF - General Surgery
Western University, 01 Jul 2023 to 31 Jul 2023
CF - General Surgery
Western University, 01 Aug 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
CF - General Surgery
Western University, 01 Jul 2024 to 31 Jul 2024
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Nov 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Nov 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Dec 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Jul 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2022 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 31 Jul 2024 |