THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 7:35:31 AM
Kassam, Adam Hussein
CPSO#:
104966
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Sep 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Sep 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dartmouth Medical School, 2014
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Runnymede Healthcare Centre
625 Runnymede Rd.
Toronto ON M6S 3A3
Phone: (416) 762-7316
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:21 Sep 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ADAM HUSSEIN KASSAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASSAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 21 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 21 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 21 Sep 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2019 to 21 Sep 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 2019 |