THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 8:54:59 AM
McCullagh-Cheung, Ashleigh Helen Woon Fei
CPSO#:
104954
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Mar 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Mar 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University Belfast School of Med, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
David Braley Health Sciences Centre
4th floor - Travel Clinic
100 Main St West
Hamilton ON L8P 1H6
Phone: (905) 525-9140 Ext. 24881
Fax: (905) 527-8847
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Ashleigh McCullagh-Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:21 Oct 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ASHLEIGH HELEN WOON FEI MCCULLAGH-CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCULLAGH-CHEUNG is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 2014 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Sep 2014 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 18 Sep 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Mar 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Mar 2016 |