THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 9:41:29 AM
McIntyre, Christopher William
CPSO#:
104923
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Sep 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
16 Sep 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: (519) 685-8028
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:29 May 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:29 May 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 2014 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2014 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 11 Sep 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Sep 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Sep 2016 |
|
Active |