THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 11:51:08 AM
McArthur, Ryan Douglas
CPSO#:
104912
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Jan 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jan 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Limerick School of Medicin, 2014
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
D-75 Wyndham St S
Guelph ON N1E 5R3
Phone: 519-265-4848
Fax: 519-837-3974
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:12 Sep 2016 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RYAN DOUGLAS MCARTHUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCARTHUR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 23 Sep 2014 to 15 Dec 2014
AVP - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 16 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 23 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Dec 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Sep 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Nov 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Jan 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jan 2017 |