THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 2:42:15 AM
Barrett, Rachel Allison
CPSO#:
104877
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Aug 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Aug 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
4001 Leslie St
North York ON M2K 1E1
Phone: 4167566479
Fax: 4167566152
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RACHEL ALLISON BARRETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARRETT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 22 Sep 2014 to 17 Oct 2014
EL - Paediatric Critical Care
McMaster University, 09 Nov 2015 to 04 Dec 2015
EL - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 11 Jan 2016 to 05 Feb 2016
EL - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 10 Apr 2017 to 05 May 2017
EL - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Oct 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Nov 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Dec 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jan 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Feb 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Apr 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 May 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 2017 |