THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 12:57:33 PM
Alhasan, Abdulaziz Ayyadh M
CPSO#:
104853
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Sep 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Sep 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Umm Al-Qura University Faculty of Medici, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
21 Queensway W
Clinic
Multispecialty
10
Mississauga ON L5B 1B6
Phone: 18556290365
Fax: 9058977780
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:06 Oct 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ABDULAZIZ AYYADH M ALHASAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALHASAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Aug 2016
CF - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Sep 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Sep 2015 |