THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 10:46:22 AM
Subramanian, Chandrasekaran
CPSO#:
104806
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: Rajah Muthiah Medical College, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Ave. E.
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5
Phone: 4164318133
Fax: 4164318192
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:07 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHANDRASEKARAN SUBRAMANIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUBRAMANIAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2014 to 19 Oct 2014
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 20 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Mar 2017
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 2017 |