THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 14:45:11 PM
Banjo, Olufemi
CPSO#:
104800
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Dec 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
16 Dec 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Yoruba
Education: Obafemi Awolowo University, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:03 May 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Psychiatry |
Effective:26 Sep 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Aug 2014 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Aug 2014 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 20 Aug 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Dec 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Dec 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Dec 2014 |
|
Active |