THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 14:37:50 PM
Dhillon, Yadwinder Singh
CPSO#:
104762
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Aug 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Russian
Education: Tver State Medical Academy, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 107
444 Douno Street
Stratford ON N5A 0E6
Phone: (519) 273-0100
Fax: (519) 273-0675
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Stratford General Hospital |
Stratford |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:05 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. YADWINDER SINGH DHILLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHILLON is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 2014 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Aug 2014 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 13 Feb 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Jan 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Jan 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Aug 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Aug 2016 |