THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 22:06:43 PM
Cardan, Robin
CPSO#:
104710
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
28 Aug 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
15 Mar 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Spartan Health Sciences University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Cardan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 15 2022
Medical Records Location
Date Received: 26 Jan 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
EL - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
EL - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Aug 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Aug 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Aug 2019 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 02 Feb 2021 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Mar 2021 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Aug 2021 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Jan 2022 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2022 |