THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 21:44:22 PM
Chandrasekaran, Nirmala
CPSO#:
104707
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Aug 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Dec 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: Tamil Nadu Dr. M.G.R. Medical University, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Maternal&Fetal medicine department
Room 15-018B
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416)864 6060 Ext. 2395
Fax: 416 864 6073
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:25 May 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Maternal Fetal Medicine |
Effective:27 Sep 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NIRMALA CHANDRASEKARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANDRASEKARAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2014 to 20 Oct 2014
PEAP - CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 21 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
CF - Maternal Fetal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 2016 |