THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 8:28:25 AM
Boldt, Ashlee Elizabeth
CPSO#:
104696
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Aug 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2014
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
102-430 Notre Dame Ave
Sudbury ON P3C 5K7
Phone: 705-222-7342
Fax: 705-222-7341
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:30 May 2017 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ASHLEE ELIZABETH BOLDT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOLDT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 25 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 31 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jun 2017 |