THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 14:44:13 PM
Taherzadeh, Shamim
CPSO#:
104673
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Mar 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Mar 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Taherzadeh-Malmiri, Shamim (used until: 02 Feb 2015 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Cape Town Faculty of Healt, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Meadowlands Family Health Centre
888 Meadowlands Drive East
Ottawa ON K2C 3R2
Phone: (613) 228-2882
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Sep 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHAMIM TAHERZADEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAHERZADEH is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 2014 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Jul 2014 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 06 Jul 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Mar 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Mar 2016 |