THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 9:43:22 AM
Haley, Christopher Philip
CPSO#:
104664
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Apr 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Apr 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Manchester Medical School, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Science centre
Department of Anaesthesia
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-7827
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority |
Moose Factory |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:07 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER PHILIP HALEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2014 to 26 Sep 2014
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 27 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Aug 2015
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 23 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Sep 2016
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Apr 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Apr 2018 |