THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 8:37:24 AM
Borkovich, Renee Michelle
CPSO#:
104662
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Oct 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Oct 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake road
Sudbury ON P3E5J1
Phone: 905-878-2383
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital |
Milton |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare |
Bracebridge |
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital |
Huntsville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
General Internal Medicine |
Effective:26 Sep 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RENEE MICHELLE BORKOVICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORKOVICH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 28 Jul 2014 to 22 Aug 2014
EL - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 24 Oct 2016 to 18 Nov 2016
EL - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Aug 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 2016 |