THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 19:59:09 PM
Govind, Mayur Harshadrai
CPSO#:
104614
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Govind, Mayur H (used until: 23 May 2016 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: St. George's University School of Medici, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
15 Gallie Court
Suite 105
Barrie
ON, L4M 7G1
Barrie ON L4M 7G1
Phone: 705 728 1962
Fax: 705 728 9455
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:15 Jul 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:27 Sep 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MAYUR HARSHADRAI GOVIND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOVIND is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 15 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 16 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 15 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 2016 |