THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 17:34:19 PM
Chaudhry, Asad Rehman
CPSO#:
104582
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jul 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
89 Norman St
Sarnia ON N7T 6S3
Phone: 519-464-4400
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bluewater Health |
Sarnia |
Brant Community Healthcare System |
Brantford |
Joseph Brant Hospital |
Burlington |
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital |
St Thomas |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:15 Dec 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ASAD REHMAN CHAUDHRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUDHRY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 2014 |