THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 0:18:06 AM
Wahab, Aryan
CPSO#:
104564
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 May 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
25 May 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Kabul University, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Rouge Valley Centenary
Shoniker Clinic
2877 A Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON M1E 4C1
Phone: (416) 281-7301
Fax: (416) 281-7465
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:11 May 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 2014 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Jul 2014 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 06 Jul 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 May 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 May 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Jan 2017 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Jan 2017 |
|
Active |