THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 5:05:20 AM
Liaghati-Nasseri, Omid
CPSO#:
104562
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Mar 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Mar 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
95 Lincoln Street
Welland ON L3C 7C3
Phone: 3653647246
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Dec 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. OMID LIAGHATI-NASSERI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIAGHATI-NASSERI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 2014 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Jul 2014 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 06 Jul 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Apr 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Nov 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Mar 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Mar 2018 |