THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 3:52:43 AM
Zani, Augusto
CPSO#:
104505
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jan 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
05 Aug 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: University of Rome, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of General and
Thoracic Surgery
1526 - 555 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7340
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatric General Surgery |
Effective:01 Jan 2016 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
PEAP - CF - Pediatric General Surgery
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Pediatric General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
CF - Pediatric General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Aug 2021 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Aug 2021 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Aug 2021 |
|
Active |