THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 13:03:16 PM
Biswas, Abhijit
CPSO#:
104504
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Aug 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Aug 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Bengali, English, Hindi
Education: University of Calcutta, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Brunswick
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance |
Chatham |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:07 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ABHIJIT BISWAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BISWAS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 03 Sep 2014
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Critical Care
University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Paediatric Critical Care
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Aug 2015
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Sep 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Aug 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Aug 2019 |