THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 13:28:23 PM
McCullagh, David Joseph
CPSO#:
104354
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Oct 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University Belfast School of Med, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharine's General Hosptial
Department of medicine
St Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Ext. 57800
Fax: 905-358-3030
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Ashleigh McCullagh-Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:19 Dec 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:23 Sep 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID JOSEPH MCCULLAGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCULLAGH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
AVP - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 18 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 19 Dec 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 18 Dec 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases
McMaster University, 19 Dec 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2019 to 02 Jul 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases
McMaster University, 03 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2019 |