THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 19:45:13 PM
Kuhlmann, Michael Allen
CPSO#:
104347
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2014
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
666 Burnhamthorpe Road
Suite 202
Etobicoke ON M9C 2Z4
Phone: (416) 622-0933
Fax: (416) 391-6118
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare |
Bracebridge |
Ross Memorial Hospital |
Lindsay |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
General Internal Medicine |
Effective:24 Sep 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL ALLEN KUHLMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUHLMANN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
AVP - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 10 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 11 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 23 Sep 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2018 |