THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 16:46:29 PM
Kendzerska, Tetyana
CPSO#:
104205
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Mar 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Mar 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian, Ukrainian
Education: BUKOVINIAN STATE MEDICAL ACADEMY, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 12765
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Respirology |
Effective:01 Mar 2017 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
PEAP - CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 28 Feb 2017
CF - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jun 2022 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration |
Expiry Date: 31 Jan 2025 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Feb 2024 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Feb 2024 |
|
Active |