THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 2:32:47 AM
Serio, Damiano
CPSO#:
104093
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Oct 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Oct 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Rosalind Franklin University of Med.& Sc, 2014
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
86 Dearham Wood
Scarborough ON M1E 1S4
Phone: 416-282-6066
Fax: 1-800-708-9888
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:30 Aug 2017 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAMIANO SERIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SERIO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 11 Jan 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 Jan 2017 to 06 Feb 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 30 May 2017 to 31 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Feb 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 May 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Oct 2017 |